PREMIER CHRISTIAN MEDIA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the Christian religion through radio broadcast, magazine publication, online activity and events. Support of all those in need through a Lifeline telephone service. Encouragement and support for the church in the use of new media. Campaigning on single-issues which are of concern to Christians and the church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£11,176,707
Donations and legacies | £8.54m | |
Charitable activities | £2.60m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £38.44k |
Total expenditure:
£10,949,355
Raising funds | £1.62m | |
Charitable activities | £9.33m | |
Other | £0 |
£43 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.62m | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.33m | |
Retained for future use | £227.35k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.62m | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.33m | |
Retained for future use | £227.40k |
People

101 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
132 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 August 1983: Standard registration
- 29 June 2021: Funds received from 1148163 PEOPLES MINISTRIES
- 16 February 2023: Funds received from 1055406 THE SANCTUARY CHARITABLE TRUST
- 11 October 2023: Funds received from 1178711 NORTH SHIELDS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
- 01 February 2024: Funds received from 515572 JEZREEL NEW TESTAMENT CHURCH
- THE CHRISTIAN MEDIA TRUST (Previous name)
- THE LUIS PALAU MISSION TO LONDON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Templeman | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Hugh Barclay | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|||||
MARK GERALD SPELMAN | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|||||
The Lady Andrea Lenzie | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jillian Louise Calland Duff | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Mbakwe | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Potts | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY COOMBS | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Sandy Muirhead | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Schofield | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.97m | £10.79m | £10.51m | £11.66m | £11.18m | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.88m | £9.87m | £10.74m | £11.60m | £10.95m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £9.52m | £8.08m | £7.72m | £8.99m | £8.54m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £31.59k | £0 | £38.02k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.42m | £2.55m | £2.42m | £2.63m | £2.60m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.15k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £158.70k | £324.71k | £42.45k | £38.44k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £343.69k | £49.33k | £120.80k | £441.95k | £253.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £12.88m | £6.88m | £8.70m | £9.77m | £9.33m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £994.84k | £2.99m | £2.04m | £1.83m | £1.62m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £96.83k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £63.89k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £145.51k | £219.42k | £258.14k | £277.71k | £368.88k | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.80k | £4.86k | £5.35k | £6.53k | £6.58k | |
|
Other assets | £1.65m | £2.90m | £2.40m | £2.56m | £2.59m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.23m | £1.63m | £1.40m | £1.51m | £1.41m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH JULY 1983 AS AMENDED ON MARCH 6 2000. AS AMENDED ON 10 FEB 2004 AS AMENDED ON 08 OCT 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 MAR 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PRODUCING AND DISSEMINATING CONTENT WHICH DELIVERS THE MESSAGE OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH VIA RADIO, DIGITAL AND PRINT MEDIA CHANNELS AND EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Premier
Unit 6
April Court
Sybron Way
CROWBOROUGH
East Sus
- Phone:
- 02073161350
- Email:
- premier@premier.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window