WOKING MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY ENCOURAGES THE PARTICIPATION AND FURTHERS THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS OF MUSIC, SPEECH AND DRAMA. THE CHARITY HOLDS A FESTIVAL COMPETITION EACH YEAR IN CLASSES COVERING CHORAL, INSTRUMENTAL, PIANO, SPEECH AND VOCAL SKILLS AND PROMOTES THE ANNUAL WOKING YOUNG MUSICIAN COMPETITION CONCERT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 05 November 1983: Standard registration
- 06 August 2018: Funds received from 278937 WOKING CONCERT SOCIETY
- WOKING YOUNG MUSICIAN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE LOOSEMORE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fei Jia | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sangeeta Saran | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
KUMI SMITH-GORDON | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Jane Elizabeth Burrows | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Tara Thomas | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Loosemore | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pat Sellers | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN NICHOLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEL SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PENELOPE DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN RAPLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.12k | £3.59k | £8.15k | £11.66k | £11.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.94k | £4.03k | £10.71k | £11.24k | £10.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH MAY 1981, AS AMENDED 29TH MAY 2001, 14TH FEBRUARY 2002, AND 16TH OCTOBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE THE PARTICIPATION AND FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ARTS IN MUSIC, SPEECH AND DRAMA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Coach House
4 Alison Close
Woking
Surrey
GU21 4BT
- Phone:
- 01483768336
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window