Financial history THE SYCAMORE TRUST

Charity number: 287668
Charity reporting is overdue by 279 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £3.47k £4.63k £3.45k £2.62k £3.63k
Total expenditure £1.26k £3.56k £2.72k £1.08k £586
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A