THE LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE COLLEGE OFFERS CARE AND EDUCATION TO GIRLS BETWEEN THE AGES OF THREE AND EIGHTEEN WITHIN THE FRAMEWORK OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. BOARDING FACILITIES ARE AVAILABLE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 24 July 1983: Standard registration
- ST FRANCIS' COLLEGE TRUST (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN GOODWIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Amanda Jane Aldridge | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Dingemans | Trustee | 16 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE RITCHIE | Trustee | 26 June 2012 |
|
|||||
EILEEN ISMAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.48m | £6.10m | £5.43m | £4.18m | £5.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.17m | £6.11m | £6.14m | £4.71m | £12.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £151.78k | £72.05k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £6.55k | £2.20k | £6.79k | £1.95k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £135.13k | £39.60k | £26.65k | £72.60k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.34m | £5.89m | £5.33m | £4.11m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £20.40k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £151.78k | £72.05k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.17m | £6.11m | £6.14m | £4.71m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £3.67k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £25.83k | £53.79k | £72.96k | £106.23k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £3.67k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 September 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH MAY 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 3RD AUGUST 1983 AND 6TH MARCH 2001 as amended on 03 Aug 2022 as amended on 22 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE SUCH EDUCATION TO BE DESIGNED TO GIVE A SOUND CHRISTIAN AND MORAL BASIS TO ALL PUPILS.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Broad House
1 The Broadway
Old Hatfield
Hertfordshire
AL9 5BG
- Phone:
- 01462670511
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window