LEXHAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 287721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants to Norfolk charities using surplus income.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £382
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 August 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NEIL WILLIAM DERICK FOSTER Trustee
THE FUEL ALLOTMENT CHARITY
Received: On time
Anthea Caroline Foster Trustee
ST MARGARET'S TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £357 £364 £374 £379 £382
Total expenditure £800 £0 £500 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 17 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 21 June 2024 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 27 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LEXHAM HALL
KINGS LYNN
NORFOLK
PE32 2QJ
Phone:
01328701288
Website:

No information available