NOMAD PLAYERS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote education in the production of plays and other stage presentations and the encouragement of the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 August 1983: Standard registration
- THE NOMAD THEATRE (Working name)
- THE NOMADS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA BEAL | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Wyn James | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PHILLIP VESSEY | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH CLAIRE VESSEY | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MARTIN | Trustee | 07 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE BURNS | Trustee | 07 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN PAYNE | Trustee | 22 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.39k | £30.25k | £19.85k | £12.30k | £40.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.73k | £57.25k | £48.81k | £10.44k | £25.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.19k | £4.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD APRIL 1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 29 MARCH 1983 AND 16 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR IN CO-OPERTATION WITH THE UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION KNOWN AS THE NOMADS IN THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS, OPERAS, AND OTHER ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NOMAD THEATRE
BISHOPSMEAD PARADE
EAST HORSLEY
LEATHERHEAD
KT24 6RT
- Phone:
- 01483284717
- Email:
- ecvessey@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window