Trustees NOMAD PLAYERS LIMITED
Charity Number: 287729

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA BEAL | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Wyn James | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PHILLIP VESSEY | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH CLAIRE VESSEY | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MARTIN | Trustee | 07 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE BURNS | Trustee | 07 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN PAYNE | Trustee | 22 November 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.