VOLUNTARY ACTION - SWINDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Voluntary Action Swindon is the local Council for Voluntary Service (CVS) in Swindon. As an infrastructure organisation, Voluntary Action Swindon offers capacity building support to voluntary and community organisations; it represents their interests and provides a voice for them in policy-making. All voluntary and community organisations in the Borough of Swindon are our target groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £228,406 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 31 October 1983: Standard registration
- 08 February 2021: Funds received from 1082809 THE FRIENDS OF SWINDON SHOPMOBILITY
- VOLUNTARY ACTION SWINDON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bob Barrett | Chair | 10 September 2015 |
|
|||||||||||
George Stephen Barnes | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Mark Adrian Flay | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Steve Henderson | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
David Malcolm Bell | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £335.90k | £341.13k | £518.44k | £471.43k | £491.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £343.42k | £340.02k | £417.63k | £468.25k | £559.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £202.88k | £198.13k | £249.82k | £216.99k | £228.41k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £6.68k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £14.39k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £81.54k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £469 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £415.36k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £417.63k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £6.41k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH DECEMBER 1981 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10TH OCTOBER 1985, CERTIFICATE OF CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 JANUARY 1983 AND RESOLUTION DATED 16 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED 23 FEBRUARY 2000. as amended on 20 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE BOROUGH OF THAMESDOWN AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF THAMESDOWN
Contact information
- Address:
-
VOLUNTARY ACTION SWINDON
1 JOHN STREET
SWINDON
SN1 1RT
- Phone:
- 01793538398
- Email:
- info@vas-swindon.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window