Financial history CHANCTONBURY CHORUS

Charity Number: 287739
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/08/2019 30/08/2020 30/08/2021 30/08/2022 30/08/2023
Total gross income £11.28k £11.94k £52 £7.51k £13.84k
Total expenditure £7.19k £8.44k £745 £6.50k £17.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A