LOUGHTON VOLUNTARY CARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Volunteers provide transport for the elderly frail to hospitals, surgeries and clinics. They also undertake shopping, befriending and the occasional odd job. A weekly escorted shopping by minibus provides social contact and enables elderly people to shop independently with help. Ipad familiarization sessions are also offered
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 08 September 1983: Standard registration
- LOUGHTON COMMUNITY CARE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carey Adams | Chair | 29 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Robinson | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Watson | Trustee | 30 March 2017 |
|
|||||
JANET ENA THOMAS | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mills | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.09k | £2.27k | £20.36k | £10.22k | £7.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.00k | £3.45k | £6.83k | £10.25k | £10.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.54k | N/A | £10.50k | £6.09k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 03 January 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MARCH 1983 AS AMENDED 29 MARCH 1990 AND 2 APRIL 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LOUGHTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF, AND IN PARTICULAR TO ASSOCIATE THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, CHURCHES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE SAID INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TO FURTHER HEALTH AND TO RELIEVE NEED, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS
Area of benefit
LOUGHTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 BROOK ROAD
LOUGHTON
IG10 1BW
- Phone:
- 02085089440
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window