Financial history SWAINSTHORPE COMMUNITY CHARITY TRUST

Charity Number: 287784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £443 £1.61k £1.65k £2.80k £2.53k
Total expenditure £675 £1.99k £777 £2.85k £2.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A