SWAINSTHORPE COMMUNITY CHARITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a village green and community facility for the benifit of inhabitants of Swainsthorpe
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 14 September 1983: Standard registration
- CHARITY FOR A VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- SWAINSTHORPE VILLAGE GREEN CHARITY (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN PARKINSON | Chair | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHEENA AILSA CURRAN | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN VIRGINIA PETERS CORBETT | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
CORINNE MARY BOYCE | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR MARGARET MARY ROBINS | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANN CHANDLER | Trustee | 03 April 2013 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY JOHN ARTHUR TALBY FCCA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £443 | £1.61k | £1.65k | £2.80k | £2.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £675 | £1.99k | £777 | £2.85k | £2.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 03/06/1983 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22/03/2001 AS AFFECTED BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER S74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 21/03/2011
Charitable objects
1. THE TRUSTEES AT ANY TIME MAY APPLY SUCH PART OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY AS THEY SEE FIT, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING LAND TO BE SETTLED UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A RECREATION GROUND. 2. THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR YEARLY INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT: PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY INSTEAD OF APPLYING INCOME AS AFORESAID ACCUMULATE THE SAME OR ANY PART THEREOF FOR APPLICATION FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING LAND FOR USE AS A RECREATION GROUND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS HEREINBEFORE CONTAINED.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SWAINSTHORPE AND SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 CHURCH ROAD
SWAINSTHORPE
NORWICH
NR14 8PH
- Phone:
- 01508470276
- Email:
- tonytalby@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window