THE SHAW TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Shaw Trust provides services to people who are disabled or otherwise disadvantaged, principally to help them find employment or to develop work and independence skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£302,005,000
Donations and legacies | £12.19m | |
Charitable activities | £285.39m | |
Other trading activities | £4.16m | |
Investments | £84.00k | |
Other | £182.00k |
Total expenditure:
£316,412,000
Raising funds | £2.20m | |
Charitable activities | £314.21m | |
Other | £0 |
£59,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £182,288,560 from 153 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.20m | |
Charitable expenditure | £314.21m |
People

5268 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
448 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 73 |
£70k to £80k | 34 |
£80k to £90k | 19 |
£90k to £100k | 19 |
£100k to £110k | 11 |
£110k to £120k | 6 |
£120k to £130k | 3 |
£130k to £140k | 2 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
£250k to £300k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Poland
- Romania
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 April 2009: Standard registration
- SHAW TRUST (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Russell Hughes | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Cedric Ntumba | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carl Simon Nicholson | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Swabey | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olly Benzecry | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Dorman | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Shaw | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Coutinho | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Stewart | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Stephen Pegge | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Omalara Oyesanya | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MICHAEL BALDWIN | Trustee | 08 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr Michael Leslie Nussbaum | Trustee | 08 February 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.37m | £223.12m | £263.40m | £295.85m | £302.01m | |
|
Total expenditure | £224.80m | £217.53m | £234.90m | £294.75m | £316.41m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £178.19m | £100.37m | £150.00m | £174.38m | £182.29m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.69m | £39.08m | £25.44m | £10.48m | £12.19m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £4.66m | £2.93m | £2.90m | £3.16m | £4.16m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £178.19m | £180.05m | £232.68m | £282.17m | £285.39m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £285.00k | £14.00k | £1.00k | £44.00k | £84.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £21.37m | £1.06m | £2.38m | £9.00k | £182.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £203.65m | £211.85m | £231.95m | £292.43m | £314.21m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £5.29m | £34.00k | £77.00k | £2.33m | £2.20m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £1.88m | £2.25m | £2.25m | £2.52m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £13.00k | £20.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £15.86m | £5.65m | £2.88m | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £166.26m | £182.03m | £195.06m | £205.91m | £195.81m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £54.85m | £77.22m | £108.15m | £96.01m | £73.35m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£93.60m | -£113.08m | -£139.47m | -£14.59m | -£6.23m | |
|
Total liabilities | £45.43m | £63.27m | £74.04m | £77.93m | £45.06m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2019
(These accounts |
25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/08/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/05/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 07/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/09/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 AUG 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE ANY PERSON WHO IS IN NEED BECAUSE OF ANY DISABILITY OR BECAUSE OF ANY OTHER DISADVANTAGE RESULTING FROM UNEMPLOYMENT, YOUTH, AGE, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, ILL-HEALTH OR BECAUSE THEY ARE OFFENDERS, EX-OFFENDERS OR ARE AT RISK OF OFFENDING; 2. THE PROMOTION OF THE HEALTH, EQUALITY AND INDEPENDENCE OF DISABLED PEOPLE; AND 3. THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY; IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING EDUCATION, TRAINING, REHABILITATION, SUPPORT, EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OPPORTUNITIES. THE COMPANY WILL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Linked charities
- 02 April 2009 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHAW TRUST
Black Country House
Rounds Green Road
Oldbury
West Midlands
B69 2DG
- Phone:
- 0300 30 33 111
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window