MAIDENHEAD MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society promotes appreciation of classical music with the presentation of public concerts and recitals in Maidenhead, Berkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 09 September 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Jones | Chair | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Joan Fone | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Norris Roscoe | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH BEHRMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAVIS GREGSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.68k | £4.80k | £16.32k | £10.98k | £15.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.42k | £6.36k | £21.33k | £17.66k | £20.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 16TH MAY 1983, 12TH SEPTEMBER 1994. as amended on 31 Oct 2017 as amended on 31 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BEAR PLACE FARM
BLAKES LANE
HARE HATCH
READING
RG10 9TA
- Phone:
- 01189403016
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window