OLDHURST VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL SITE TO ENABLE THE CONSTRUCTION OF A NEW VILLAGE HALL IN THE PARISH OF OLD HURST FOR THE FUTURE USE OF THE PARISH OF OLD HURST WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING QUALITY OF LIFE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 16 April 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Eggleston | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Xanthe Fox | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Duke | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debra Stuart | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Sylvia Jackson | Trustee | 05 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patrick McCann | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Fox | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £306 | £0 | £583 | £10 | £1.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £589 | £417 | £434 | £383 | £486 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 05 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 21 FEBRUARY 1984 AND ORDER DATED 16 JULY 2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF OLDHURST WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF OLDHURST
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Dacre Close
Old Hurst
HUNTINGDON
Cambridgeshire
PE28 3AU
- Phone:
- 07725240462
- Email:
- debralynnstuart@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window