Financial history NAFSIYAT

Charity Number: 287819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £378.66k £547.21k £618.14k £639.02k £638.28k
Total expenditure £327.78k £463.44k £586.49k £677.76k £726.97k
Income from government contracts £266.13k £247.90k £258.00k £204.50k £372.21k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £204.50k £140.67k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £3.54k £9.97k £5.05k £2.20k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £20.84k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £522.81k £564.71k £600.44k £581.77k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £16 £11 £673 £1.72k
Income - Other N/A £0 £43.44k £32.86k £52.59k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £448.94k £575.95k £658.62k £715.49k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £12.51k £10.30k £18.97k £11.31k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £11.70k £2.06k £1.65k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £1.99k £242 £168 £168