Accounts and annual returns SOUTHCOURT BAPTIST CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 287821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 May 2024 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 May 2024 103 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window