Financial history THE SARAH AND SAMUEL LIPTON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 287830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £26.12k £112.44k £8.64k £24.00k £19.50k
Total expenditure £26.06k £91.34k £32.07k £24.56k £16.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A