Accounts and annual returns BAE SYSTEMS ROCHESTER CENTRAL CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 287838
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 February 2025 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 March 2024 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required