BAE SYSTEMS ROCHESTER CENTRAL CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 287838
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The BAE Systems Rochester Central Charity Fund was established to collect employee charitable contributions to distribute to charities mainly in the Kent and Medway area. The fund is managed by the Rochester Central Charity Fund Committee which is made up of employees from BAE Systems Rochester.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £12,536
Total expenditure: £9,540

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Medway

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 March 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GEC - MARCONI AVIONICS LIMITED CENTRAL CHARITY FUND (Previous name)
  • GEC AVIONICS LIMITED CENTRAL CHARITY FUND (Previous name)
  • MARCONI AVIONICS, ROCHESTER, CENTRAL CHARITY FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GARY LAMBKIN Chair
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.37k £14.51k £14.24k £15.25k £12.54k
Total expenditure £16.77k £11.52k £12.47k £19.93k £9.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 February 2025 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 March 2024 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
B A E Systems
Marconi Way
Rochester
ME1 2XX
Phone:
03300484590
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available