THE DOWNLAND CHORALE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Members of Downland Chorale belong to the choir to enjoy rehearsing and performing together. Founded over 40 years ago, membership varies between 50- 60, and covers the full voice range. Members fund rehearsals and performances, but members of the public are invited to attend our concerts to help defray costs. We currently have no sponsorship or local authority funding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
41 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 29 September 1983: Standard registration
- PURLEY PHILHARMONIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Vivien Viggiani | Chair | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joan Vivian May Currion | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Penny Baker | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Donaldson Watts-Read | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Howard Eldridge | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Collymore | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Margaret Cole | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNE LOUISE ODAMS | Trustee | 20 October 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.96k | £7.95k | £15.86k | £18.29k | £22.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.62k | £12.98k | £17.53k | £19.48k | £23.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 09 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH SEPTEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED 11 NOVEMBER 1991 as amended on 18 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF SOCIETY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Ridgemount Avenue
COULSDON
Surrey
CR5 3AQ
- Phone:
- 07973871951
- Email:
- chair@downlandchorale.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window