THE ANDREW RAWLINGS MEMORIAL FUND

Charity Number: 287884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects of the charity are to help young people with their training and education in agricultural science, whether at full time college or on short term courses, by making a grant towards this end.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £17
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • North Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 August 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR B SMITH Chair
None on record
MR ED SIMMONS Trustee
None on record
JAMES WILLIAM BARDWELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £25 £25 £0 £2 £17
Total expenditure £0 £300 £0 £550 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 November 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MOORSIDE FARM
STATION ROAD
BACKWELL
BRISTOL
BS48 1TH
Phone:
01275853383
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available