THE HOLMAN-CLIMAX MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's activity is to promote,improve,develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of music, in particular choir singing, by the presentation of public concerts and recitals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
37 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 06 October 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE ROBINSON | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BIRD | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM THOMAS | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROGER MOYLE | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
PIERS MARGETTS | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL LEVICK | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
COLIN PETER JONES | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
HAROLD WALKEY | Trustee | 27 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS HUGH TREVARTHEN | Trustee | 25 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN LATHAM | Trustee | 27 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES HENRY GEACH | Trustee | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.86k | £0 | £3.91k | £10.62k | £10.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.71k | £2.88k | £4.13k | £8.99k | £15.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH SEPTEMBER 1983, AMENDED 24 JULY 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, AND IN PARTICULAR CHOIR SINGING, BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE CHOIR THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 The Grange
Rectory Road
CAMBORNE
Cornwall
TR14 7DA
- Phone:
- 07786 922281
- Email:
- molinjones@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window