CHELMSFORD COUNTY HIGH SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the pupils of the school by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities for education at the school. The Association may:a) Foster more extended relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school; b) Engage in activities which support the school and advance the education of the pupils attending it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 11 November 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Maranca | Chair | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Reade | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Fearn | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samira Ayyubi | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Lawlor | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.44k | £21.27k | £15.12k | £30.48k | £37.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.25k | £8.48k | £12.40k | £26.69k | £47.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 June 2021 | 343 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH APRIL 1981 as amended on 20 Oct 2021 as amended on 05 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE SAME EITHER AS CAPITAL OR AS INCOME FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON BY THE CENTRE AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chelmsford County High School
Broomfield Road
CHELMSFORD
CM1 1RW
- Phone:
- 01245352592
- Email:
- PA@cchs.essex.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window