EALING SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur orchestra promoting usually five main concerts a year and participating in other events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Ealing
Governance
- 17 October 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jo Boswell | Chair | 06 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Jonathan Humphreys | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer May Davies | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Owen Davies | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Alice Colyer | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE MARGARET WALSH | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alvaro Jose Rebon | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gary Walker | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
David James Russell Smith | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Richard Kenneth Partridge | Trustee | 10 December 1981 |
|
|||||
PAUL MICHAEL GRIGG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.21k | £23.00k | £49.99k | £47.25k | £64.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.08k | £17.46k | £54.31k | £41.72k | £59.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 26 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 17TH JUNE 1982 AS AMENDED ON 06 NOV 1997 AS AMENDED ON 04 MAY 1998 AS AMENDED ON 06 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
"TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF ORCHESTRAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC ORCHESTRAL CONCERTS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE ORCHESTRA THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME."
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 ELERS ROAD
LONDON
W13 9QD
- Phone:
- 02085674075
- Email:
- secretary@ealingso.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window