HOPE TRUST WELLINGBOROUGH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Usual church activities together with running a community based project called The HOPE Project which provides the following activities and services in the local community: The Well community cafe, Cygnets pre-school, Family Support Service, Skills & Learning courses and youth work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2017
Total income includes £104,556 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 18 October 1983: Standard registration
- 05 November 2018: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 05 November 2018: Funds transferred to 251549 ELIM FOURSQUARE GOSPEL ALLIANCE
- HOPE PROJECT (Working name)
- THE HEMMINGWELL CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST (Previous name)
- THE NEW LIFE CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £319.48k | £307.89k | £307.80k | £225.08k | £144.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £305.98k | £286.08k | £230.52k | £206.61k | £200.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £197.74k | £138.59k | £104.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 01 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | 01 February 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 25 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | 25 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 04 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | 04 February 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/07/1983 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 15/12/1986 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17/11/1988 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 04/09/1994 AS AMENDED ON 28/10/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN CAUSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window