MYTCHETT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mytchett Centre is a community association with halls that can be hired, The sports field have two football pitches used throughout the football season, out of season the football fields are used for local events, children, (kick about, rounder, soft ball cricket, )The type of use Play school, sports, weddings, plays, Big Band Nights, Dancing, and a yearly firework night celebration
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,282 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 October 1983: Standard registration
- THE MYTCHETT CENTRE (Working name)
- MYTCHETT COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER HASTINGS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Linda West | Trustee | 01 January 1990 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Donohoe | Trustee | 01 January 1990 |
|
|
||||
SHAWN DONOHOE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MIKE TILSTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.58k | £86.31k | £100.73k | £122.03k | £154.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.23k | £80.02k | £69.11k | £110.43k | £131.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £45.91k | £41.15k | £6.15k | £1.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 18TH SEPTEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED 11TH MARCH 1988 AND 31ST MARCH 1989
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF HE INHABITANTS OF MYTCHETT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THEE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
MYTCHETT AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
MYTCHETT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
THE MYTCHETT CENTRE
140 MYTCHETT ROAD
MYTCHETT
CAMBERLEY
GU16 6AA
- Phone:
- 01252373073
- Email:
- mytchettcentre@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window