CHARITY OF MRS K W BRADFORD (DECEASED)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity makes small pay-outs to elderly patients & families registered at Steyning Medical Practice for education, training or for the relief of poverty to buy small items.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- West Sussex
Governance
- 27 October 1983: Standard registration
- WINIFRED BRADFORD MEMORIAL TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alexander Rainbow | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Margaret Taylor | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £742 | £784 | £848 | £877 | £921 | |
|
Total expenditure | £550 | £210 | £1.02k | £284 | £350 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT BRIGHTON 9TH AUGUST 1983
Charitable objects
ASSISTANCE FOR THE POOR AND NEEDY RESIDENTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF STEYNING HEALTH CENTRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Steyning Medical Practice
Tanyard Lane
Steyning
BN44 3RJ
- Phone:
- 01903497227
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window