SELSLEY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity Number: 288065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A) FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS & OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE C OF E IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, SELSLEY; B) PROMOTING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE C OF E FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE SAID ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH BY MEANS OF SUNDAY SCHOOLS; C) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN & YOUNG PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE SAID ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £2,583
Total expenditure: £1,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 November 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SELSLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DIANA JACQUELINE MERRETT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £2.94k £2.94k £2.26k £3.50k £2.58k
Total expenditure £5.90k £5.90k £1.90k £1.90k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 03 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 03 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 March 2021 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Wold
Selsley West
STROUD
Gloucestershire
GL5 5LJ
Phone:
01453453047
Website:

No information available