EDGBARROW SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parent Teacher Association raises funds for the school to meet funding requests from teachers and support staff, and it also provides social opportunities for the school community. We do this through a variety of fundraising events and grant submissions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Bracknell Forest
Governance
- 15 November 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ella Page | Chair | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carole Barke | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
THERESA SPANSWICK | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.86k | £39.04k | £73.70k | £43.13k | £47.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.10k | £48.18k | £92.85k | £37.25k | £33.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 128 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1982 AMENDED SEPTEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE EDGBARROW
Contact information
- Address:
-
EDGBARROW SCHOOL
GRANT ROAD
CROWTHORNE
RG45 7HZ
- Phone:
- 01344772658
- Email:
- PTA@edgbarrowschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window