GRAFTY GREEN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a place/building whereby activities may be undertaken in terms of entertainment, social gatherings, interest clubs and sport.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 14 November 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Thompson | Chair | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Bridges | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Dann | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Hughes | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roy Rayner | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Thompson | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JACQUI THOMPSON | Trustee | 03 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH BURCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.15k | £22.07k | £15.41k | £12.55k | £31.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.89k | £23.99k | £17.22k | £8.61k | £9.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.19k | £5.75k | £500 | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF APPOINTMENT DATED 14 MARCH 1967 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 14 JANUARY 2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF GRAFTY GREEN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
GRAFTY GREEN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Oaks
Church Road
Grafty Green
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME17 2BA
- Phone:
- 07932112730
- Email:
- jon@graftygreenalpacas.co.uk
- Website:
-
graftygreenvillagehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window