HAVERHILL COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes such charitable purposes for the benefit of the inhabitants of Haverhill as the trustee think fit, and in particular, by the provision of premises for the benefit of the public. The Charity allows Haverhill Town Council use of the Old Town Hall as an Arts Centre and Council offices. Other parts of the building are let to local charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £285,203 from 4 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 02 November 1983: Standard registration
- 05 October 2018: Funds received from 1145215 HAVERHILL IN BLOOM
- HAVERHILL ARTS CENTRE (Working name)
- HAVERHILL TOWN HALL CHARITY (Working name)
- TOWN HALL ARTS CENTRE - HAVERHILL (Working name)
- THE TOWN HALL HAVERHILL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAVERHILL TOWN COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.21k | £119.81k | £195.88k | £229.26k | £391.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.76k | £142.22k | £189.13k | £238.75k | £385.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £33.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.48k | £84.87k | £130.05k | £130.55k | £285.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 13/04/2015
Charitable objects
CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF HAVERHILL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF PREMISES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
THE TOWN OF HAVERHILL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Haverhill Town Hall
High Street
Haverhill
CB9 8AR
- Phone:
- 01440712858
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window