CHISENHALE DANCE SPACE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support the development of artists, the participation in dance by the community, and the development of cutting edge dance and movement practice and debate. We do this by: - offering bespoke artistic advice, space and time for professional development, sharings and events. - running workshops and classes for the diverse communities of East London
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,188 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 17 March 1986: Standard registration
- 03 July 2024: Funds received from 1029506 GREENWICH DANCE AGENCY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Urja Desai Thakore | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Heather Doole | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Taylor | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Rose | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bakani Pick-Up | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN JAMES BRETT | Trustee | 24 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £227.55k | £207.82k | £365.25k | £129.46k | £229.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £237.40k | £197.28k | £264.07k | £237.63k | £228.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARITICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH JULY 1983
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION AND PERFORMANCE OF DANCE, BALLET AND SIMILAR CHOREOGRAPHIC ARTS, AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DANCE, CHOREOGRAPHY, MUSIC, DRAMA, MIME, SINGING, LITERATURE, SCULPTURE AND PAINTING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHISENHALE DANCE SPACE
64-84 CHISENHALE ROAD
LONDON
E3 5QZ
- Phone:
- 02089816617
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window