DOLPHIN HOUSE CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help maintain, and improve, the health of children and families in Brighton and Hove by treating children with a range of complementary therapies allied with education to encourage healthier lifestyles and thus contribute to the development of healthier communities, particularly in those areas where poor health is associated with social exclusion and economic deprivation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
Governance
- 20 December 1983: Standard registration
- 25 August 2022: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- DOLPHIN HOUSE CLINIC (Working name)
- THE CHILDREN'S CLINIC AT DOLPHIN HOUSE (Previous name)
- THE FOUNDATION FOR TRADITIONAL MEDICINE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.70k | £95.78k | £91.03k | £84.06k | £20.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.66k | £83.85k | £80.30k | £79.43k | £33.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 21 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 05 March 2020 | 126 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH MARCH 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19TH OCTOBER 2000 AS AMENDED 1ST MAY 2001
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS BY THE PRACTICE OF COMPLEMENTARY THERAPIES AND OTHER FORMS OF MEDICINE AND TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH THERAPIES AND OTHER SUCH FORMS OF MEDICINE
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF BRIGHTON AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window