KINGS CORNER PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A youth project, concentrating on those who are 15-21 years old in the London Borough of Islington providing education, training and other activities to help them develop to their full potential
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Islington
Governance
- 23 January 1984: Standard registration
- 16 May 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £179.27k | £145.59k | £112.32k | £169.64k | £13.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.94k | £145.33k | £155.69k | £155.98k | £13.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 14 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 17 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 17 August 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 13 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 11 July 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 26 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 10 October 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH OCTOBER 1983, AS AMENDED 10 DECEMBER 2001, 23 OCTOBER 2003 AND 13 APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
(A) EDUCATE AND TRAIN YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON UNDER THE AGE OF 25, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THE AGE GROUP 15 TO 21, THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL, MORAL AND SPIRITUAL ACTIVITIES AND CAPACITIES THAT THEY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS PERSONS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIVE MAY BE IMPROVED AND (B) PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK EXPERIENCE AND TRAINING AS WILL ENABLE THEM TO ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP VOCATIONAL SKILLS
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window