SEVENOAKS CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Counselling individuals, couples and family groups, including children and teenagers in a wide range of situations : mental and emotional issues, serious illness, post-trauma, marital and relationship problems, etc. 2. In-service training of counsellors and others working in the field. 3. The professional supervision of counsellors. Area: West Kent, East and West Sussex, Bromley, Bexley etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bexley
- Bromley
- East Sussex
- Kent
- West Sussex
Governance
- 29 November 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucinda Anne Bruce Wright | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Clarkson | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr ESTHER JOY CHEESMAN | Trustee | 17 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANNE CLARE BOURNE | Trustee | 04 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr Mary Elizabeth Wright | Trustee | 23 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS STIVEN | Trustee | 16 May 2011 |
|
|||||
GILL CLAYTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.53k | £94.29k | £94.58k | £102.42k | £119.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.66k | £94.78k | £93.85k | £101.26k | £133.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.40k | N/A | £2.50k | £4.70k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25TH OCTOBER 1983 as amended on 14 Apr 2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY ESTABLISHING AND CARRYING ON A SERVICE OF COUNSELLING BASED SOLELY ON CHRISTIAN DOCTRINES, PRINCILES AND FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Morgan Way
Paddock Wood
TONBRIDGE
Kent
TN12 6FS
- Phone:
- 07503712728
- Website:
-
sevenoakscounselling.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window