Financial history THE SHECHEM HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 288193
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £135.68k £134.89k £119.65k £14.73k £210.40k
Total expenditure £133.85k £101.96k £124.51k £39.54k £211.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £94.12k £13.28k £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0