THE SOCIETY FOR PIRANDELLO STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education of the public in the works of Pirandello through advocacy, advice, information, sponsoring and undertaking research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 November 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 November 1983: Standard registration
- THE BRITISH PIRANDELLO SOCIETY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof John Barnes | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lady Julie Dashwood | Trustee | 27 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alberto Godioli | Trustee | 13 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Valeria Taddei | Trustee | 13 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALBERICA BAZZONI | Trustee | 15 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROF MICHAEL SUBIALKA | Trustee | 18 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROF ANGELO MARIA MANGINI | Trustee | 20 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROF BART VAN DEN BOSSCHE | Trustee | 20 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr SHIRLEY WYNNE VINALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF JOSEPH FARRELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Prof URSULA FANNING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/10/2019 | 15/10/2020 | 15/10/2021 | 18/11/2022 | 18/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.17k | £1.60k | £828 | £1.46k | £1.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.27k | £1.37k | £968 | £1.37k | £1.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 November 2023 | 21 May 2025 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 November 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 October 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 October 2020 | 03 December 2021 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 October 2019 | 03 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH MAY 1983, AS AMENDED 19TH JANUARY 1991
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE WORKS OF PIRANDELLO.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SCHOOL OF LANGUAGES AND LITERATURES
UNIVERSITY COLLEGE DUBLIN
DUBLIN 4
IRELAND
XX0 0XX
- Phone:
- 00353-1-4978341
- Email:
- john.c.barnes@ucd.ie
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window