WALTON-IN-GORDANO VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leisure and sport
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Somerset
Governance
- 30 November 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Wilson | Chair | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Edwards | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hickman | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
TRACY Lynn CLAMP | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL DICKINSON | Trustee | 19 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Stott | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH JANE TOVEY | Trustee | 12 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.96k | £14.02k | £16.20k | £2.99k | £3.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.67k | £9.55k | £3.47k | £5.33k | £7.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 3RD JULY 1987
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF WALTON-IN-GORDANO (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREARION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. THE SAID LAND AND BUILDING SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
WALTON IN GORDANO
Contact information
- Address:
-
Walton-In-Gordano Village Hall
Clevedon Road
Walton-In-Gordano
Clevedon
North Somerset
BS21 7AN
- Phone:
- 07720 665343
- Email:
- tracy.clamp@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window