Trustees WALTON-IN-GORDANO VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 288211

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Wilson | Chair | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Edwards | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hickman | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
TRACY Lynn CLAMP | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL DICKINSON | Trustee | 19 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Stott | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH JANE TOVEY | Trustee | 12 September 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.