Financial history NORWICH GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity number: 288213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £261.28k £193.49k £229.57k £245.78k £258.40k
Total expenditure £236.24k £217.30k £222.96k £235.70k £255.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £62.02k N/A N/A N/A