NORWICH GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Norwich Gymnastics Club provides gymnastics for the local community and to children from also the surrounding areas. We provide boys and girls activities from pre-school, beginners, recreational to high level competition work. The children can take part in various activities from basic gymnastic classes to acrobatic gymnastics, acrobatic tumbling to boys and girls artistic gymnastics.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 25 November 1983: Standard registration
- GLENHILL GYMNASTIC CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD EDWARD HALFORD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SUE BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERRY PYLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAYLEY SHANE BOND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £261.28k | £193.49k | £229.57k | £245.78k | £258.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £236.24k | £217.30k | £222.96k | £235.70k | £255.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £62.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH JULY 1983 AS AMENDED ON 1ST DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS AND WHO ARE IN FULL TIME EDUCATION RESIDING IN THE AREA OF NORWICH AND ITS SORROUNDING DISTRICTS BY PROVIDING FOR THEM FACILITIES FOR AND INSTRUCTION IN GYMNASTICS.
Area of benefit
NORWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 DENMEAD CLOSE
NORWICH
NR4 6NB
- Phone:
- 01603502976
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
norwichgymnasticsclub.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window