A AND S GRAHAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants are made at the discretion of the trustees in accordance with the Trust Deed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 December 1983: Standard registration
- 23 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 September 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS N S BOUCAI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAURA GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mrs E J Haguenauer | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANDRA GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW GRAHAM MA FRICS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.22k | £72.22k | £60.48k | £56.85k | £90.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.91k | £55.09k | £54.07k | £36.20k | £65.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 13 July 2022 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 13 July 2022 | 158 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 18TH OCTOBER 1983
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR INSTITUTIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE AND IN SUCH SHARES AS EITHER OF THE SETTLORS MAY DURING THEIR LIFETIME FROM TIME TO TIME IN WRITING DIRECT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sterling House
27 Hatchlands Road
REDHILL
Surrey
RH1 6RW
- Phone:
- 02073513560
- Email:
- andrew@grahamtrust.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window