Governing document PALINGSWICK HOUSE LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/09/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/01/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/05/2000 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10/01/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/01/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 4.1 TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE AREA OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM AND THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY CHARITABLE AND NON CHARITABLE BODIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION, OR BY PROCURING THE PROVISION, OF TRAINING, ADMINISTRATIVE AND SUPPORT SERVICES 4.2 TO PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE AREA OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RESOURCE CENTRE TO BE USED BY THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR. THE 'VOLUNTARY SECTOR' MEANS CHARITIES, COMMUNITY SOCIAL ENTERPRISES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS 4.3 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES THAT ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE AREA OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED THE CHARITY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION. THE AREA OF BENEFIT (“AREA OF BENEFIT”) SHALL BE THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.