THE PROJECTED PICTURE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Collects and restores old cinema projection equipment for display and the education of people of all walks of life in particular school children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 November 1983: Standard registration
- P P T (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Robert Lawrence | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|||||||
Alex Liam Cooper | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
NIGEL WOLLAND MBE | Trustee | 28 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.64k | £5.97k | £5.37k | £11.69k | £26.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.11k | £6.81k | £6.45k | £7.34k | £11.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 January 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 04 January 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH APRIL 1983 AS AMENDED 21ST APRIL 1990 AND 17 MAY 2008.
Charitable objects
(1) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CINEMA ENGINEERING AND MOTION PICTURE TECHNOLOGY. (2) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION AND RESTORATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF EQUIPMENT AND MACHINERY FOR PREPARATION AND DISPLAY OF PROJECTED IMAGES BOTH MOVING AND STILL AND BOTH HISTORIC AND MODERN INCLUDING ALL ANCILLARY EQUIPMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Projected Picture Trust
Dean Clough Mills
HALIFAX
West Yorkshire
HX3 5AX
- Phone:
- 07936735613
- Email:
- contact@theppt.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window