Financial history KEMPSHOTT SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 288332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.84k £13.59k £10.81k £10.53k £17.99k
Total expenditure £8.74k £25.43k £9.66k £9.69k £18.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A