Accounts and annual returns THE PROFESSIONAL BILLIARDS AND SNOOKER PLAYERS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 288352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 20 May 2024 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 12 May 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required