GARDEN SUBURB SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE MAIN PURPOSE OF THE ORGANISATION IS TO FOSTER AND ENCOURAGE THE FULLEST CO-OPERATION BETWEEN THE HOME AND THE SCHOOL BY: PROMOTING AMENITIES FOR THE GENERAL COMFORT, WELFARE AND EDUCATION OF ALL CHILDREN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL MEETINGS PROVIDING IMPROVEMENTS TO EDUCATIONAL EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES RAISING FUNDS FOR THE ABOVE PURPOSES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 January 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marina Borges de Oliveira | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sanaz Saifolahi | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Ramazzina | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew McHerron | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Zabeti-Targhi | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
SARAH SANDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EILEEN BHAVSAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.06k | £38.90k | £31.62k | £47.97k | £51.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.53k | £43.09k | £23.74k | £44.04k | £68.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 November 2024 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2023
(These accounts |
07 November 2024 | 130 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 July 2024 | 392 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2022
(These accounts |
26 July 2024 | 392 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2022 | 357 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2022 | 357 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 March 2022 | 624 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 March 2022 | 624 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/11/1983.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE GARDEN SUBURB SCHOOL, CHILDS WAY, LONDON NW11 BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Garden Suburb Schools PTA
Childs Way
LONDON
NW11 6XU
- Phone:
- 020 8455 8198
- Email:
- office@gsis.barnetmail.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window