Financial history THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE SOUTHAMPTON EYE UNIT

Charity Number: 288424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £24.00k £11.34k £11.00k £54.84k £78.25k
Total expenditure £81.91k £1.79k £9.00k £38.19k £90.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A