Financial history COX TRUST

Charity number: 288461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £116.81k £68.32k £65.69k £61.20k £76.22k
Total expenditure £40.25k £40.97k £44.28k £155.62k £59.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A